GA HR707 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the House Study Committee on Homicide Cold Case Resources; and for other purposes.
Title
House Study Committee on Homicide Cold Case Resources; create
Sponsors
Rep. William Werkheiser [R] | Rep. Stacey Evans [D] | Rep. Marcus Wiedower [R] | Rep. Houston Gaines [R] |
Rep. Leesa Hagan [R] | Rep. Spencer Frye [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-03 | House | House Hopper |