GA HR901 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION compensating Mr. Darrell Lee Clark; and for other purposes.
Title
Clark, Mr. Darrell Lee; compensate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - Adopt: House Vote #617 (Y: 156 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-01-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-01-26 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-25 | House | House Hopper |