GA HR993 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to create a business court with state-wide jurisdiction; to provide for venue and uniformity of jurisdiction and powers; to provide for selection, terms, and qualifications of business court judges; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; to provide for related matters; and for other purposes.
Title
Business court; state-wide jurisdiction; create - CA
Sponsors
Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Terry Rogers [R] | Rep. Trey Rhodes [R] | Rep. Christian Coomer [R] |
Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Sen. Brian Strickland [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #815 (Y: 45 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #887 (Y: 120 N: 52 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #648 (Y: 142 N: 25 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #887 (Y: 120 N: 52 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #648 (Y: 142 N: 25 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-06 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-06 | Act 410 | |
2018-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-01 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-31 | House | House Hopper |