GA SB1 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-08 - Veto V20
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-08 - Veto V20
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 4 of Chapter 12 of Title 45 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, known as the "Budget Act," so as to provide short titles; to provide for the application of zero-base budgeting to the budget process; to provide for analysis of departmental and program objectives; to provide for consideration of alternative funding levels; to provide for departmental priority lists; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Zero-Base Budgeting Act; provide for the application
Sponsors
Sen. Ronnie Chance [R] | Sen. John Douglas [R] | Sen. Jack Hill [R] | Sen. Judson Hill [R] |
Sen. Dan Moody [R] | Sen. David Shafer [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-01-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #12 - Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-08 | Veto V20 | |
2010-06-08 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-21 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | House Third Readers | |
2010-04-13 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-04-03 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2009-03-12 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-02 | House Second Readers | |
2009-01-30 | House First Readers | |
2009-01-29 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-01-29 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-01-27 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-01-26 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-01-14 | Senate Read and Referred |