GA SB225 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - House Insists
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - House Insists
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 10 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to obstruction of public administration and related criminal offenses, so as to provide for a new offense of transmitting a false report of a crime; to provide for penalties; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Criminal Offenses; provide for new offense of transmitting a false report; penalties
Sponsors
Sen. Charlie Bethel [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. John Crosby [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] |
Sen. Joshua McKoon [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - House - House Vote #750 - Passage (Y: 154 N: 5 NV: 14 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #448 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #448 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | House Insists | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Disagrees House Amend/Sub | |
2012-03-26 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-19 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-06 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-03 | House First Readers | |
2012-02-02 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-02 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-01-31 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-09 | Senate Recommitted | |
2011-03-11 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Read and Referred |