GA SB227 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-2-86 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to special license plates promoting and supporting certain worthy agencies, funds, or nonprofit corporations with proceeds disbursed to the general fund and the agency, fund, or nonprofit corporation, so as to establish a specialty license plate to benefit the Georgia Alliance of Boys & Girls Clubs, Inc.; to provide for related matters; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Special License Plates; benefit the Georgia Alliance of Boys & Girls Clubs, Inc.; establish
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #397 (Y: 48 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Vote #269 (Y: 163 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #172 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Vote #269 (Y: 163 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #172 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-02 | Act 148 | |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2019-03-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Hopper |