GA SB283 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - House Insists
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - House Insists
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to competencies and core curriculum, so as to authorize school systems to provide instruction on the history of traditional winter celebrations; to provide for displays; to provide for limitations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; authorize school systems; provide instruction on history of traditional winter celebrations
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] | Sen. Francis Millar [R] |
Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Bruce Thompson [R] | Rep. Micah Gravley [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #801 (Y: 122 N: 51 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #802 (Y: 119 N: 52 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #435 (Y: 43 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #802 (Y: 119 N: 52 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #435 (Y: 43 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | House | House Insists |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Disagrees House Amend/Sub |
2014-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2014-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-02-05 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
2013-12-03 | Senate | Senate Prefile |