GA SB284 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 4 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to tax sales, so as to provide for provisions governing the creation and operation of land banks on and after July 1, 2011; to provide a short title and a statement of construction, intent and scope; to provide for legislative findings; to define certain terms; to provide for the creation, existence, and board membership of land banks; to provide for land bank powers, including those powers related to the acquisition and disposition of tax delinquent and other properties; to provide for public meetings of land banks, for the adoption of rules and regulations to address potential conflicts of interest, and for the dissolution of land banks; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Land Bank Act; governing creation/operation of land banks; provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Golden [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #838 - Agree To House Substitute (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - House Vote #786 - Passage (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #558 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - House Vote #786 - Passage (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #558 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-02 | Act 729 | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-04 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-27 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-27 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-22 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-12 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-07 | House First Readers | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Read and Referred |