GA SB290 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 23 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to licensing, so as to clarify those individuals not required to be licensed as an insurance agent; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance; clarify those individuals not required to be licensed as insurance agent
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - House - House Vote #726 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #454 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #454 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 374 | |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2016-03-10 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-10 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-17 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Senate Hopper |