GA SB291 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-08 - Veto V17
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-08 - Veto V17
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 3 of Article 4 of Chapter 11 of Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to carrying and possession of firearms, so as to revise comprehensively the laws concerning the carrying of concealed weapons; to revise the method by which licenses to carry weapons are issued; to prohibit the carrying of certain items in certain buildings; to provide exceptions; to provide for related matters; to amend Part 1 of Article 3 of Chapter 3 of Title 38 of the O.C.G.A., relating to emergency powers of the Governor, so as to revise the powers of the Governor to suspend or limit the sale, dispensing, or transportation of firearms during states of emergency; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Firearms; laws concerning carrying of concealed weapons; revise comprehensively
Sponsors
Sen. John Douglas [R] | Rep. J.B. Powell [R] | Sen. Chip Rogers [R] | Sen. David Shafer [R] |
Sen. Freddie Sims [D] | Sen. Ross Tolleson [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #632 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 43 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-08 | Veto V17 | |
2010-06-08 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-27 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | House Third Readers | |
2010-04-20 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-30 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-26 | House First Readers | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-02-17 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-02-16 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Read and Referred |