GA SB303 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Vetoed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Effective Date 2023-05-05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Effective Date 2023-05-05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a homestead exemption from Fulton County ad valorem taxes for county purposes in the amount of 50 percent of the assessed value of the homestead for residents of that county who are 65 years of age or older and whose household income does not exceed 200 percent of the federal poverty level, approved May 13, 2008 (Ga. L. 2008, p. 3945), so as to remove the requirement for seniors to have to reapply for such exemption every two years; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Fulton County; ad valorem taxes for county purposes; seniors have to reapply for such exemption every two years; remove the requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #336 (Y: 163 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #272 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #272 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Effective Date 2023-05-05 | |
2023-05-05 | Veto V14 | |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2023-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-29 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-03-23 | House | House First Readers |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Senate Hopper |