GA SB308 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to health, so as to establish the Positive Alternatives for Pregnancy and Parenting Grant Program; to provide for a purpose; to provide for definitions; to provide for administration and duties; to provide for grant services; to provide criteria; to provide for record maintenance and reporting; to provide for reports to the General Assembly; to provide for funding; to provide for redesignation of certain Code provisions and conforming changes; to expand authorized expenditure of contributed funds; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Positive Alternatives for Pregnancy and Parenting Grant Program; establish; definitions; administration and duties
Sponsors
Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. David Shafer [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. William Ligon [R] |
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Jesse Stone [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #760 (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Vote #737 (Y: 103 N: 52 NV: 9 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #450 (Y: 38 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Vote #737 (Y: 103 N: 52 NV: 9 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #450 (Y: 38 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 360 | |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2016-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-16 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senate Hopper |