GA SB319 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 19 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to textbooks for elementary and secondary education, so as to require the definition of "textbook" to include computer hardware and technical equipment necessary to support the use of nonprint or digital content; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; definition of "textbook" include computer hardware/technical equipment to support use of nonprint or digital content
Sponsors
Sen. John Douglas [R] | Sen. Greg Goggans [R] | Sen. Johnny Grant [R] | Sen. Bill Hamrick [R] |
Sen. Seth Harp [R] | Sen. Cecil Staton [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #705 - Agree To House Substitute (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #482 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #482 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-27 | Act 490 | |
2010-05-27 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-03 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-12 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2010-03-31 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-31 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-10 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-04 | House Second Readers | |
2010-02-03 | House First Readers | |
2010-02-02 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-02-02 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-02-01 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-01-28 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-01-26 | Senate Read and Referred |