GA SB339 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 6 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the Georgia Aviation Authority, so as to provide for the transfer of certain personnel, aircraft, and other assets from the Georgia Aviation Authority to the Department of Natural Resources and the State Forestry Commission; to provide for related matters; to amend Title 12 of the O.C.G.A., relating to conservation and natural resources, so as to transfer certain personnel, assets, and liabilities of the Georgia Aviation Authority to the Department of Natural Resources and the State Forestry Commission; to provide the Department of Natural Resources and the State Forestry Commission with certain authority and duties with regard to aviation; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Aviation Authority; provide transfer of certain personnel, aircraft to Dept. of Natural Resources and State Forestry Commission
Sponsors
Sen. Charlie Bethel [R] | Sen. Judson Hill [R] | Sen. Francis Millar [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Tommie Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #636 - Agree To House Substitute (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House Vote #567 - Passage (Y: 135 N: 31 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #457 - Passage As Amended (Y: 50 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House Vote #567 - Passage (Y: 135 N: 31 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #457 - Passage As Amended (Y: 50 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-02 | Act 738 | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-02 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-14 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2012-02-29 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-29 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-21 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-15 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2012-02-09 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-08 | House First Readers | |
2012-02-07 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-07 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-02 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-01 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-25 | Senate Read and Referred |