GA SB350 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 7 of Chapter 13 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to taxation of consumer fireworks, so as to dedicate moneys collected from the excise tax on the sale of consumer fireworks for trauma care, fire services, and local public safety purposes; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date contingent on a certain ratification of the Constitution of Georgia; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Taxation on Consumer Fireworks; dedicate moneys collected; trauma care, fire services, and local public safety purposes
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] | Sen. David Shafer [R] |
Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Rep. Paul Battles [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #777 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Vote #743 (Y: 165 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #488 (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Vote #743 (Y: 165 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #488 (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 387 | |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2016-03-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-25 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hopper |