GA SB355 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Act 556
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Act 556
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 46-2-25 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to procedure for changing any rate, charge, classification, or service and recovery of financing costs, so as to change certain provisions relating to the recovery of the costs of financing the construction of a nuclear generating plant; to prohibit the recovery of financing costs from certain customers; to provide for reimbursement of financing costs; to provide for applicability; to provide the accounting method to be used in the event the scheduled date for commercial operation of such plant is exceeded; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Nuclear Generating Plant; recovery of the costs of financing the construction; provisions; change
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Francis Millar [R] | Sen. Lindsey Tippins [R] | Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] |
Sen. Elena Parent [D] | Sen. Nan Orrock [D] | Rep. Andrew Welch [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - House - House Vote #746 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #498 (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #510 (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #498 (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #510 (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Act 556 | |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2018-03-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-19 | House | House Postponed |
2018-03-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Senate Hopper |