GA SB374 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - House Reconsidered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - House Reconsidered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 15 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, the "Professional Engineers and Land Surveyors Act of 2021," so as to change provisions relating to land surveyor interns and professional land surveyors; to provide for educational requirements; to provide for apprenticeships; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Professional Engineers and Land Surveyors Act of 2021"; land surveyor interns and professional land surveyors; change provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - House - Reconsider: House Vote #756 (Y: 82 N: 68 NV: 9 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Passage: House Vote #755 (Y: 59 N: 96 NV: 5 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #519 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Passage: House Vote #755 (Y: 59 N: 96 NV: 5 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #519 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | House Reconsidered |
2024-03-21 | House | House Third Reading Lost |
2024-03-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Senate Hopper |