GA SB383 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 9 of Title 9 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions for arbitration, so as to repeal Part 2, relating to international transactions; to provide for a short title; to provide for a statement of purpose; to provide for applicability; to provide for definitions; to provide for procedure; to provide for court intervention; to provide for an arbitration agreement; to provide for selection and disqualification of arbitrators; to provide for challenges to arbitrator selection and substitution of arbitrators; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
'Georgia International Commercial Arbitration Code'; repeal Part 2, relating to international arbitration
Sponsors
Sen. Charlie Bethel [R] | Sen. Jason Carter [D] | Sen. Bill Hamrick [R] | Sen. Joshua McKoon [R] |
Sen. Jesse Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - House - House Vote #749 - Passage (Y: 159 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #489 - Passage (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #489 - Passage (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-02 | Act 713 | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-04 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-26 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-19 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-23 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-22 | House First Readers | |
2012-02-21 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-21 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-09 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-06 | Senate Read and Referred |