GA SB387 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 359
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 359
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act entitled "An Act to create a new charter for the City of Dahlonega in the County of Lumpkin," approved April 12, 1982 (Ga. L. 1982, p. 4353), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 11, 2010 (Ga. L. 2010, p. 3522), so as to provide for the filling of vacancies; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Dahlonega; filling of vacancies; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - House Vote #677 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #459 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #459 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Act 359 | |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2018-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate Hopper |