GA SB402 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Act 423
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Act 423
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to enact the "Achieving Connectivity Everywhere (ACE) Act"; to amend Titles 32, 36, 48, and 50 of the O.C.G.A., relating to highways, bridges, and ferries, local government, revenue and taxation, and state government, respectively, so as to provide for broadband services planning, deployment, and incentives; to provide authorization for the Department of Transportation to take certain actions to enable the rights of way of interstate highways to be used for the deployment of broadband and other communications technologies; to change certain definitions relative to the "OneGeorgia Authority Act" to include broadband services; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Achieving Connectivity Everywhere (ACE) Act"
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Sen. Frank Ginn [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #881 (Y: 160 N: 3 NV: 14 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #824 (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - House - House Vote #754 (Y: 161 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #489 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #824 (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - House - House Vote #754 (Y: 161 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #489 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Act 423 | |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2018-03-29 | House | House Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2018-03-23 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed 171st, 116th, 172nd |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed 51st, 18th, 56th |
2018-03-23 | House | House Insisted |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Disagreed House Amend or Sub |
2018-03-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hopper |