GA SB410 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-5-311 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to creation of county boards of equalization, duties, review of assessments, and appeals, so as to provide an alternative means of recovering costs of litigation and attorney's fees in ad valorem tax appeals; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ad Valorem Tax Appeals; alternative means of recovering costs of litigation and attorney's fees; provide
Sponsors
Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Sen. Jesse Stone [R] | Sen. Larry Walker [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #793 (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - House - House Vote #787 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - House Vote #752 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #594 (Y: 34 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #605 (Y: 53 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - House - House Vote #787 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - House Vote #752 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #594 (Y: 34 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #605 (Y: 53 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Effective Date | |
2020-07-22 | Act 482 | |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-26 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended |
2020-06-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-24 | House | House Postponed |
2020-06-23 | House | House Postponed |
2020-06-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-06-16 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2020-06-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-13 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hopper |