GA SB428 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 13 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to administrative procedure, so as to provide for agency reports regarding federal government mandates and duplicate state and federal regulation; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Administrative Procedure; provide for agency reports regarding federal government mandates and duplicate state/federal regulation
Sponsors
Sen. Ronnie Chance [R] | Sen. Hardie Davis [D] | Sen. Francis Millar [R] | Sen. Chip Rogers [R] |
Rep. Doug Stoner [D] | Sen. Ross Tolleson [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - House - House Vote #772 - Passage (Y: 119 N: 38 NV: 15 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #567 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #567 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-01 | Act 638 | |
2012-05-01 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-09 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-27 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-27 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-21 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-12 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-07 | House First Readers | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Read and Referred |