GA SB509 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to abolish the Glynn County Police Department; to provide for the transfer of assets and property of such police department; to provide for the transfer of duties and responsibilities of such police department; to provide for related matters; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, contingencies, and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Glynn County Police Department; abolish; transfer of assets and property of such police department; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-23 - House - House Vote #699 (Y: 152 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #650 (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-05 Effective Date
2020-08-05 Act 609
2020-08-05SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2020-06-25SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2020-06-23HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2020-06-23HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-06-20HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2020-06-20HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-06-19HouseHouse First Readers
2020-06-18SenateSenate Transmitted House
2020-06-18SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2020-06-18SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2020-06-16SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-06-15SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback