GA SB68 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 16-14-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to definitions regarding racketeer influenced and corrupt organizations, so as to include the offense of dogfighting as racketeering activity; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations; offense of dogfighting as racketeering activity; include
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - House - Passage: House Vote #322 (Y: 163 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #49 (Y: 47 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #49 (Y: 47 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Effective Date 2023-07-01 | |
2023-05-01 | Act 91 | |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2023-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-16 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Senate Hopper |