GA SB98 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the O.C.G.A., relating to local boards of education, so as to prohibit local board of education members from discussing individual personnel matters with school officials except under certain circumstances provided by law; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Local Boards of Education; local board of education members from discussing individual personnel matters with school officials; prohibit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Senate Hopper |