GA SR636 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION commending the special friendship between Georgia and the People's Republic of China and recognizing February 3, 2020, as China Day at the state capitol; and for other purposes.
Title
China Day; recognize February 3, 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/56952 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/188656 |