GA SR843 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - Act 628
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - Act 628
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A RESOLUTION honoring the life of Mr. Bert Ward and dedicating a bridge in his memory; and for other purposes.
Title
Bert Ward Memorial Bridge; Catoosa County; dedicate
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #845 - Agree To House Substitute (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House Vote #763 - Adopt (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #597 - Adoption By Substitute (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #598 - Adoption By Substitute (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House Vote #763 - Adopt (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #597 - Adoption By Substitute (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #598 - Adoption By Substitute (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | Act 628 | |
2012-04-25 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-04 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-26 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-22 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-13 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-12 | House First Readers | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Read and Referred |