GA SR899 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Senate Alcohol Franchise Law Study Committee; and for other purposes.
Title
Senate Alcohol Franchise Law Study Committee; create
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ginn [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] | Sen. David Lucas [D] |
Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. Lindsey Tippins [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Hopper |