HI HB1011 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1011
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes State Health Planning and Development Agency to mandate the submission of Medicare Advantage (Medicare Part C) administrative data and healthcare services claims.
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-01 | House | Re-referred to HLT/HSH, FIN, referral sheet 10 |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HLT/HSH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1011&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1011_.HTM |