HI HB1013 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1013
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Restructures the Hawaii Invasive Species Council as the Hawaii Invasive Species Authority, administratively attached to the Department of Agriculture, to coordinate implementation of the Hawaii Interagency Biosecurity Plan and to improve coordination of the State's invasive species prevention, early detection, rapid response, control, enforcement, and outreach programs. Appropriates funds to implement the Authority and relevant interagency invasive species projects. (HB1013 HD1)
Title
Relating To Invasive Species Program Administration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 516) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, Kong, Say, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-14-17 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-02-03 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on EEP with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-02-03 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 19), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EEP. |
2017-02-01 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-01-17 8:45AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to AGR, EEP, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1013 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
SB879 (Same As) 2017-01-25 - Referred to AEN, WAM.
SB879 (Same As) 2017-01-25 - Referred to AEN, WAM.