HI HB1013 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1013
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Board of Land and Natural Resources to extend leases of public lands for commercial, industrial, or resort use upon approval of a proposed development agreement to make substantial improvements to the existing improvements. Repeals on June 30, 2026.
Title
Relating To Lease Extensions On Public Land.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1013 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
SB1167 (Same As) 2021-02-10 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
SB1167 (Same As) 2021-02-10 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1013&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB1013_.HTM |