HI HB1052 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-31 - (H) Act 068, on 5/26/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1171).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-31 - (H) Act 068, on 5/26/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1171).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the insurance code to comply with the federal Nonadmitted and Reinsurance Reform Act of 2010 relating to surplus lines insurance and participate in a multi-state cooperative to collect surplus lines premium taxes and fees and distribute to the individual states the taxes and fees assessed. Effective June 1, 2011. (HB1052 CD1)
Title
Surplus Lines Insurance; Insurance Code
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-31 | (H) Act 068, on 5/26/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1171). | |
2011-05-31 | (S) Act 068, 5/26/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1171). | |
2011-05-06 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 702). | |
2011-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 694). | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Pine excused (2). | |
2011-04-29 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-29 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 89). | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 89) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2011-04-29 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-04-29 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Chong, Ito, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Souki. | |
2011-04-29 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 4:00PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-04-27 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-11 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-04-25 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-11 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-04-21 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-25-11 10:15AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 648). | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Taniguchi, Slom. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) House conferees appointed: Herkes, Keith-Agaran, Chong Co-Chairs; Ito, Souki, Marumoto. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 540) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1079) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-04-05 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Galuteria, Green, Nishihara, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-11 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to CPN. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 235). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 826) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-11 10:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3). | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 560) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-14 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Carroll, Herkes, Ito, Luke, Morita, B. Oshiro, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, McKelvey, Souki, Thielen. | |
2011-02-14 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Carroll, Ito, Keith-Agaran, Luke, Morita, B. Oshiro, Tsuji, Ching, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, McKelvey, Souki, Thielen. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-14-11 2:05PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-02-07 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Monday, 02-07-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1279 (Same As) 2011-03-22 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Har excused (2).