HI HB1099 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1099
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends subsection 329-101(d), Hawaii Revised Statutes, to require that a dispenser of a controlled substance report the filling of a controlled substance prescription and the dispensing of drug samples to the State's Electronic Prescription Accountability System at least once every day, or a report of "zero" be reported not less than once every seven days if no controlled substances prescriptions are filled or drug samples are dispensed.
Title
Relating To The Electronic Prescription Accountability System.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1397 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB1099 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3
HB1099 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1099&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1099_.HTM |