HI HB1114 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Act 126, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Act 126, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends fines for Hawaii Occupational Safety and Health violations and requires the Director of Labor and Industrial Relations to adjust the penalties each year pursuant to federal law. Requires the Director of Labor and Industrial Relations to report to the Legislature each year. (HB1114 CD1)
Title
Relating To Occupational Safety And Health Penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | House | Act 126, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227). |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Act 126, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227). |
2017-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Tupola voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 134). |
2017-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 134) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Taniguchi, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 1:30PM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 1:30PM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-20-17 1:45PM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Taniguchi Co-Chair; K. Rhoads. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Holt Co-Chairs; Matsumoto. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 545). |
2017-04-07 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 504) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) English). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-17. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1330) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-17 1:30PM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 975) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-17 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 57). |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Cachola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Tupola, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 783), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Cullen, Choy, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Quinlan, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, DeCoite; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Tupola, Ward; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Luke, Tokioka. |
2017-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-23-17 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3). |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 404) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-09 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matsumoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-09-17 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB980 (Same As) 2017-01-25 - Referred to JDL, WAM.