HI HB1121 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1121
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Commission on Water Resource Management to conduct an update of the statewide framework for the Hawaii water plan to provide guidance for Hawaii's future water plan. Makes an appropriation. Takes effect 12/31/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Water Security.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1495) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 255). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakamura excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1147), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from WLH/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 600) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH/EEP on Wednesday, 02-06-19 10:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to WLH/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1121 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.