HI HB1172 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - The committee on EDT deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - The committee on EDT deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that, notwithstanding the provisions of the Internal Revenue Code to the contrary, the amount of the state tax credit for research activities shall be calculated based on all qualified research expenses for the taxable year instead of on the increase of expenses over past years. (HB1172 HD1)
Title
Tax Credit; Research Activities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | Senate | The committee on EDT deferred the measure. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-15 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDT, WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 283). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Har, Jordan, Onishi, Oshiro, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Kong, Takayama voting no (4) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Har, Jordan, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 628) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-03-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-04-15 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Pending introduction. |