HI HB1196 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1196
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the state auditor to conduct a performance and management audit of the ten agriculture parks operated by the agricultural resource management division of the department of agriculture.
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1196 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1196&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1196_.HTM |