HI HB1235 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1235
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for purchasing digital cameras for all adult correctional officer control rooms at state correctional facilities and body cameras for adult correctional officers to wear while on duty at state correctional facilities. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Corrections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC, WAM. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 419). |
2023-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1163), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-01 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2023-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-23 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-16 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). |
2023-02-16 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 527) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2023-02-10 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-10-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-02-08 | House | Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 188) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2023-02-03 | House | The committee on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Chun, Ganaden, Ichiyama, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CMV on Friday, 02-03-23 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to CMV, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1470 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB1235 (Carry Over) 2023-03-10 - Referred to PSM, JDC, WAM.
HB1235 (Carry Over) 2023-03-10 - Referred to PSM, JDC, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1235&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1235_HD2_.HTM |