HI HB1275 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-5)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Act 006, on 4/9/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1106).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-5)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Act 006, on 4/9/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1106).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes and designates the ukulele as the official auana musical instrument of the State. Establishes and designates the pahu as the official kahiko musical instrument of the State.
Title
Official Auana State Musical Instrument; Official Kahiko State Musical Instrument; Designation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | House | Act 006, on 4/9/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1106). |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Act 006, 4/9/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1106). |
2015-03-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-03-25 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 373). |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-25-15. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 973) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Nishihara, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-15 1:30PM in conference room 414. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to GVO. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 119). |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-05 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Say, Souki excused (2). |
2015-03-05 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 588), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-26 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Brower, Choy, DeCoite, Kawakami, Kong, Onishi, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Ohno, Ward. |
2015-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Thursday, 02-26-15 11:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to VMI, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1363 (Same As) 2015-03-12 - Referred to VMI, referral sheet 30
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1275&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB1275_.HTM |