HI HB1309 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1309
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for state supplemental payments to certain care homes that care for clients eligible for federal supplemental security income or public assistance, or both. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Care Homes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). |
2023-02-16 | House | Reported from HLT/HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 578) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-10 | House | The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Amato, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-10 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HUS on Friday, 02-10-23 8:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1309 (Carry Over) 2023-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1309&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1309_HD1_.HTM |