HI HB1408 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the counties to accept the surrender of a private road in cases where there has been an absence of any act of private ownership over the road for five years. Exempts the State and counties from performing any maintenance on a surrendered road and from liability arising from use of the road until the State or county performs maintenance work on the road. (HB1408 HD3)
Title
Private Roads; Repair and Maintenance
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | The committee on TRA deferred the measure. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRA/PSM deferred the measure until 03-24-15 2:50PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRA/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-15 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to TRA/PSM, JDL/WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 320). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 822) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-25-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-20 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 562) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-02-19 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami. |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-19-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Takumi excused (1). |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 205) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-02-09 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, LoPresti, Ichiyama, Johanson, Keohokalole, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Takumi. |
2015-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 02-09-15 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |