HI HB144 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB144
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals section 46-19.8, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to allow the counties to determine the proper requirements for residential fire sprinkler systems.
Title
Relating To Public Safety.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-17 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB191 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB144 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 1
HB144 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=144&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB144_.HTM |