HI HB1442 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1442
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers regulatory jurisdiction for pharmacy benefit managers from the Department of Health to Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs, including provisions for reimbursement amounts, disclosure of information, complaints process, and enforcement. (HB1442 HD1)
Title
Relating To Pharmacy Benefit Managers.
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2). |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 457), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:35PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2). |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 152) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. |
2019-01-31 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2019-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 01-31-19 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1442 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
SB1521 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
SB1521 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).