HI HB1453 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-08 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-08 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes civil unions and provides to civil union partners the benefits and obligations conferred upon a couple by marriage. Provides for termination of civil unions through the judicial system.
Title
Legal Relationships
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-02-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-08-11 2:15PM in House conference room Auditorium. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1453 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HB1453_.HTM |