HI HB1478 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 05-01-15 at 4:15 PM in Conference Room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 05-01-15 at 4:15 PM in Conference Room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the state program to co-manage the federally established Hawaiian Islands humpback whale national marine sanctuary. Establishes a sanctuary co-manager position. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Hawaiian Islands Humpback Whale National Marine Sanctuary Program; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 05-01-15 at 4:15 PM in Conference Room 423. |
2015-04-30 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 1:15PM in conference room 423. |
2015-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-30-15 1:00PM in conference room 423. |
2015-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-24-15 4:00PM in conference room 423. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: L. Thielen Chair; Gabbard, Riviere Co-Chairs; Galuteria, Slom. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ing, Rhoads, Cullen Co-Chairs; Evans, Pouha. |
2015-04-20 | House | Re-referred to OMH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 632) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1465) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-02-15 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Reported from WTL/ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1098) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Galuteria, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 03-24-15 3:50PM in conference room 225. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Galuteria, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-15 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to WTL/ENE, WAM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 133). |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Jordan, Kawakami voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 702), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Tokioka; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola. |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-26-15 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-20 | House | Re-referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2015-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Har, Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 222) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-02-12 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-11 | House | Bill re-scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-12-15 11:35AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-12-15 11:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-15 11:35AM. |
2015-02-10 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 02-11-15 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to OMH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |