HI HB1524 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1524
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires principal brokers to ensure associated real estate licensees are responsive to association-related requests from owners and Real Estate Commission-generated information is distributed to an association, board, or unit owner within ten days after receiving a request for information. (HB1524 HD1)
Title
Relating To Real Estate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 560) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2017-02-15 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Choy, Cachola, Ito, Onishi, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Wednesday, 02-15-17 9:00AM in House conference room 429. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to IAC, CPC, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1524 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
Subjects
Common Interest Communities
Documents, Records, and Information
Principal Brokers
Real Estate Commission
Real Estate Licensees
Documents, Records, and Information
Principal Brokers
Real Estate Commission
Real Estate Licensees