HI HB1584 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1584
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Office of Planning to conduct a comprehensive study of a statewide carbon tax. Effective 7/1/2100. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Carbon Emissions.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-19 10:35AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from HRE/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1388) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, K. Kahele, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Keith-Agaran. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 3:15PM in conference room 414. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Re-Referred to HRE/EET, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 329). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1133), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 515) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-02-13 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3). |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 220) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-01-31 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen. |
2019-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 01-31-19 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-29 | House | Re-referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP/LHE, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1584 (Carry Over) 2019-04-04 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.