HI HB1639 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 677).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 677).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the employer base composite monthly contribution effective 1/1/2025 by 5.2 per cent of the 2024 employer base. Provides that effective 1/1/2026, the employer base composite monthly contribution will be based on the change in medicare part B premiums from 2024 to 2025 and at a two-year lag thereafter. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Employer-union Health Benefits Trust Fund Base Composite Monthly Contribution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 677). |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Aquino Chair; Wakai Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 509) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3783) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-24 10:15AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Reported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3195) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Ihara, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-24 3:30PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to LBT, WAM. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 76). |
2024-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Quinlan, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 808-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-27 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran. |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-24 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Kitagawa excused (2). |
2024-02-01 | House | Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 6-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-01-30 | House | The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Sayama. |
2024-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 01-30-24 9:30AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |