HI HB1678 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-10 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-10 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a person from advertising or conducting a live musical performance or production through the use of a deceptive affiliation under certain conditions. Enables action against deceptive practices by imposing penalties and private right of action. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Musical Performances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Tourism & International Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Tourism & International Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 425). |
2020-07-10 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2020-07-10 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2020-07-08 | Senate | Received notice of House intent to agree to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 421). |
2020-07-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 575) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 07-06-20. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3747) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 06-30-20 9:46AM in conference room 016. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3451) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC/WAM. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 291). |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Eli excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 973-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger. |
2020-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-27-20 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-19 | House | Re-referred to TIA, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2020-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Saiki, Yamashita excused (3). |
2020-02-06 | House | Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 144-20), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2020-02-04 | House | The committees on TIA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Holt, DeCoite, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Creagan. |
2020-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TIA on Tuesday, 02-04-20 9:05AM in House conference room 312. |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to TIA, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2020-01-15 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-14 | House | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Deceptive Advertising
Musical Performance
Musical Production
Right of Action
Truth in Music Advertising Act
Musical Performance
Musical Production
Right of Action
Truth in Music Advertising Act