HI HB168 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes a voter with special needs, including a disability, to request that a ballot be forwarded by electronic transmission at any time. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Electronic Transmission Of Ballots.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-04-25SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 859).
2019-04-24HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1).
2019-04-24HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2019-04-24SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 853).
2019-04-23HouseReconsideration of action taken on 04-02-19.
2019-04-12HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 898).
2019-04-12SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Gabbard, Kim, Fevella.
2019-04-03SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 535).
2019-04-02HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-01HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 549) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-01SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Ruderman). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-29Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-01-19.
2019-03-29SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-29SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1669) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to JDC.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 149).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakashima excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HousePassed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1).
2019-02-28HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 927), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-06HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Thielen.
2019-02-05HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-06-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-05HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-19.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-05-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 2
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-17HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB136 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback